Dixon et al v. City of St. Louis et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rozelle, David Dixon, Richard Robards and Aaron Thurman
Defendant: City of St. Louis, Dale Glass, Rex Burlison, Thomas McCarthy, David Roither, Vernon Betts, Elizabeth Hogan and Robin Ransom
Case Number: 4:2019cv00112
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Referring Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Case by City Defendants filed by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Wayne, Seth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Judges filed by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Wayne, Seth)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file, by April 2, 2019, memoranda of law addressing the propriety and possible scope of such depositions and the feasibility of protective or alternative measures for obtaining the information sought. (Response to Court due by 4/2/2019.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/22/2019. (AFC)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Docket Text ORDER Re: #62 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 Response in Opposition to Motion, #59 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 20, 2019. (SAA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 62 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 Response in Opposition to Motion, #59 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Wayne, Seth)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Docket Text ORDER Re: #58 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 15, 2019. (SAA)
March 14, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sauer, Dean)
March 14, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sauer, Dean)
March 14, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Sauer, Dean)
March 11, 2019 Filing 57 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. By Consent of Defendants and Including Proposed Competing Scheduling Orders. (Kutnik-Bauder, Jacqueline)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Docket Text ORDER Re: #54 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 Motion to Dismiss Case, #49 Motion to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 6, 2019. (SAA)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Docket Text ORDER Re: #53 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File the following: Joint Proposed Schedule; Proposed extension date 3-11-2019 by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, David Roither; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 6, 2019. (SAA)
March 5, 2019 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #49 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Wayne, Seth)
March 5, 2019 Filing 53 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Joint Proposed Schedule ;Proposed extension date 3-11-2019 by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, David Roither. (Isaacson, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Vernon Betts, City of St. Louis, Dale Glass. (Dierker, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Vernon Betts, City of St. Louis, Dale Glass. (Dierker, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Sauer, Dean)
March 1, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Sauer, Dean)
March 1, 2019 Filing 48 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter T. Reed for Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Reed, Peter)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and shall file, by March 6, 2019, a joint proposed schedule for proceedings on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 41). The proposed schedule should set forth a schedule for any discovery, including any expedited discovery sought, a proposed date for a hearing on the motion, and an estimate of the time necessary for such hearing. Prior to the hearing, the Court will issue a Case Management Order requiring the parties to file pre-trial materials, including but not limited to a joint stipulation of uncontested facts, a list of all witnesses and a short synopsis of the subject matter of their expected testimony, a list of all discovery responses and portions of depositions to be offered into evidence, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and trial briefs. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/6/2019.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 27, 2019. (BRP)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Docket Text ORDER Re: #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Motion to Certify Class, #41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 27, 2019. (SAA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 MOTION to Certify Class , #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Isaacson, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Wayne, Seth)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Docket Text ORDER Re: #42 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Class-wide Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 22, 2019. (SAA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Class-wide Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Class-wide Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wayne, Seth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dixon Declaration, #2 Exhibit Rozelle Declaration, #3 Exhibit Aaron Thurman Declaration, #4 Exhibit Robards Declaration, #5 Exhibit Forester Declaration, #6 Exhibit Waldron Declaration, #7 Exhibit Roy Declaration, #8 Exhibit Carter Stewart Declaration, #9 Exhibit R. Lee Declaration, #10 Exhibit Bracken Declaration, #11 Exhibit Anderson Declaration, #12 Exhibit Marcum Declaration, #13 Exhibit White Declaration, #14 Exhibit Carter Declaration, #15 Exhibit Johnson Declaration, #16 Exhibit M. Lee Declaration, #17 Exhibit Moorehead Declaration, #18 Exhibit Williams Declaration, #19 Exhibit Adrianna Thurman Declaration, #20 Exhibit S. Thurman Declaration, #21 Exhibit Martin Declaration, #22 Exhibit Bryant Declaration, #23 Exhibit Holman Declaration, #24 Exhibit Harris Declaration, #25 Exhibit Lehmkuhl Declaration, #26 Exhibit Tinyan Declaration, #27 Exhibit Dailey Declaration, #28 Exhibit Heimberger Declaration, #29 Exhibit Letter from The Bail Project, #30 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wayne, Seth)
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Megan Kathleen G Bruyns for Defendants Vernon Betts, City of St. Louis, Dale Glass. (Bruyns, Megan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT by David Dixon. (Harvey, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM re #37 Status Report by Defendants Vernon Betts, City of St. Louis, Dale Glass. (Dierker, Robert)
February 4, 2019 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT by David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Strode, Blake)
February 1, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Status Conference held on 2/1/2019. The Court hears from attorney in regards to the status of the case. The TRO is resolved until the Court hears from counsel. (Court Reporter:Susan Moran, Susan_Moran@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7983) (proceedings started: 12:39pm) (proceedings ended: 1:02pm)(Deputy Clerk: K. Battle)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael-John Voss, Robert Friedman (telephone), Sima Atri, Alexander Karakatsanis (telephone), Blake Strode, Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder, Seth Wayne (telephone), and Thomas Harvey (telephone))(Appearance for Defendant: Robert Dierker, Robert Isaacson, and Dean Sauer) (KCB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas C. Albus for Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Albus, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacki J. Langum for Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Langum, Jacki)
February 1, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM re #19 Stipulation Defendant Judges' Memorandum Per the Parties' Stipulation Paragraph 6 by Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Isaacson, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Isaacson for Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Isaacson, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Dean John Sauer for Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Sauer, Dean)
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert H. Dierker for Defendants Vernon Betts, City of St. Louis, Dale Glass. (Dierker, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander G. Karakatsanis for Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Karakatsanis, Alexander)
January 31, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL Brief in Response to Court Order by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Wayne, Seth)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER Re: #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth Wayne by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 31, 2019. (SAA)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER Re: #8 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 31, 2019. (SAA)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER Re: #6 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 31, 2019. (SAA)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER Re: #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert D. Friedman by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 31, 2019. (SAA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Pritchett for Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Pritchett, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles D. Shull for Defendants Rex Burlison, Elizabeth Hogan, Thomas McCarthy, Robin Ransom, David Roither. (Shull, Charles)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert D. Friedman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7009109) by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Friedman, Robert)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall proceed as set forth in the stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that parties shall appear for a status conference on the record in this matter on Friday, February 1, 2019, at 12:30 PM. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/30/19. (KXS)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Voss, Michael-John)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2019 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Aaron Thurman, Jeffrey Rozelle, Richard Robards, David Dixon. The parties reach an agreement before the hearing commences. The parties discuss the details of a stipulation before the Court. The parties will submit the final stipulation today. The case is set for a status hearing on Friday, February 1, 2019 at 12:30 PM. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Patti Dunn Wecke, Patti_Dunn_Wecke@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984) (proceedings started: 9:34 AM) (proceedings ended: 10:33 AM)(Deputy Clerk: B. Porter)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael John Voss, Sima Atri, Blake Strode, John Waldron, Thomas Harvey, Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder, Alec Karakatsanis (via phone))(Appearance for Defendant: Thomas Albus, Robert Dierker) (BRP)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline Marie Kutnik-Bauder for Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Kutnik-Bauder, Jacqueline)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas B. Harvey for Plaintiff David Dixon. (Harvey, Thomas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael-John Voss for Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Voss, Michael-John)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Pursuant to the order of recusal by the Honorable Ronnie L. White, United States District Judge entered on January 29, 2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig, United States District Judge. District Judge Ronnie L. White no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (MRC)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth Wayne. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7004491) by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Wayne, Seth)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States District Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case, and the Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign the case to another judge. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/29/2019. (Forwarded Order to KXS to re-assign case.)(AFC)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). - The above styled and numbered case was opened on January 28, 2019, and randomly assigned to the Honorable Shirley Padmore Mensah, United States Magistrate Judge. After assignment of this case, the plaintiffs filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Therefore, this case must be reassigned to a District Judge of the court. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Ronnie L. White, United States District Judge. (JWD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Blake Alexander Strode for Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Strode, Blake)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by John McCann Waldron for Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Waldron, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Atri, Sima)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Atri, Sima)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of TRO Motion, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G)(Atri, Sima)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Proposed Bond Order)(Atri, Sima)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Atri, Sima)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs David Dixon, Richard Robards, Jeffrey Rozelle, Aaron Thurman. (Atri, Sima)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 8. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-7002160, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Aaron Thurman, Jeffrey Rozelle, David Dixon, Richard Robards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N, #15 Exhibit Ex. O, #16 Exhibit Ex. P, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q, #18 Exhibit Ex. R, #19 Exhibit Ex. S, #20 Exhibit Ex. T, #21 Exhibit Ex. U, #22 Exhibit Ex. V, #23 Exhibit Ex. W, #24 Exhibit Ex. X, #25 Exhibit Ex. Y, #26 Exhibit Ex. Z, #27 Exhibit Ex. AA, #28 Exhibit Ex. BB, #29 Exhibit Ex. CC, #30 Exhibit Ex. DD, #31 Exhibit Ex. EE, #32 Exhibit Ex. FF, #33 Exhibit Ex. GG, #34 Exhibit Ex. HH, #35 Exhibit Ex. II, #36 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #37 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #38 Waiver of Service Waiver, #39 Waiver of Service Waiver, #40 Waiver of Service Waiver, #41 Waiver of Service Waiver, #42 Waiver of Service Waiver, #43 Waiver of Service Waiver, #44 Waiver of Service Waiver, #45 Waiver of Service Waiver)(Atri, Sima)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon et al v. City of St. Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G Bruyns
Represented By: Robert H. Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Glass
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G Bruyns
Represented By: Robert H. Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Burlison
Represented By: Charles D. Shull
Represented By: Michael E. Pritchett
Represented By: Peter T. Reed
Represented By: Thomas C. Albus
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Robert J. Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Charles D. Shull
Represented By: Michael E. Pritchett
Represented By: Peter T. Reed
Represented By: Thomas C. Albus
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Robert J. Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Roither
Represented By: Charles D. Shull
Represented By: Michael E. Pritchett
Represented By: Peter T. Reed
Represented By: Thomas C. Albus
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Robert J. Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Betts
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G Bruyns
Represented By: Robert H. Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hogan
Represented By: Charles D. Shull
Represented By: Michael E. Pritchett
Represented By: Peter T. Reed
Represented By: Thomas C. Albus
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Robert J. Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Ransom
Represented By: Charles D. Shull
Represented By: Michael E. Pritchett
Represented By: Peter T. Reed
Represented By: Thomas C. Albus
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Robert J. Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rozelle
Represented By: Sima Atri
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Kutnik-Bauder
Represented By: John McCann Waldron
Represented By: Blake Alexander Strode
Represented By: Seth T. Wayne
Represented By: Jacki J. Langum
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Robert D. Friedman
Represented By: Michael-John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dixon
Represented By: Sima Atri
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Kutnik-Bauder
Represented By: John McCann Waldron
Represented By: Blake Alexander Strode
Represented By: Seth T. Wayne
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Jacki J. Langum
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Robert D. Friedman
Represented By: Michael-John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Robards
Represented By: Sima Atri
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Kutnik-Bauder
Represented By: John McCann Waldron
Represented By: Blake Alexander Strode
Represented By: Seth T. Wayne
Represented By: Jacki J. Langum
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Robert D. Friedman
Represented By: Michael-John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Thurman
Represented By: Sima Atri
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Kutnik-Bauder
Represented By: John McCann Waldron
Represented By: Blake Alexander Strode
Represented By: Seth T. Wayne
Represented By: Jacki J. Langum
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Robert D. Friedman
Represented By: Michael-John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?