Hayden v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Melisha Y. Hayden
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00187
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Melisha Y. Hayden. Nancy A. Berryhill served. (KEK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Melisha Y. Hayden. Jeffrey B. Jensen served. (KEK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Melisha Y. Hayden. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (KEK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Melisha Y. Hayden. (KEK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KEK)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/7/19. (KEK)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/7/19. (KEK)
February 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Direct-Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Melisha Y. Hayden. (Nuyen, Erica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Melisha Y. Hayden. (Nuyen, Erica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Melisha Y. Hayden. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Nuyen, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisha Y. Hayden
Represented By: Erica L. Nuyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?