Dzidic v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Dinko Dzidic
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company and Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00194
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/8/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/14/2019 02:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/15/2019. (AFC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kinder, Jacqueline)
February 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Dinko Dzidic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MFG)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Brendon T. Sanders for Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Sanders, Brendon)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(Kinder, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. Parent companies: GEICO Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Kinder, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Kinder for Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC00080, with receipt number 0865-7028628, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinder, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dzidic v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinko Dzidic
Represented By: Mark A. Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Brendon T. Sanders
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Brendon T. Sanders
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?