United States of America v. $73,460.00 U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and David Luis Cruz-Medina
Defendant: $73,460.00 U.S. Currency and $15,080.00 U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Oscar Valdivia and Jesus Tirado
Case Number: 4:2019cv00246
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff David Luis Cruz-Medina. (Arana, Victor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Interested Party Oscar Valdivia. (Arana, Victor)
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Interested Party Jesus Tirado. (Arana, Victor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 CLAIM filed by claimant Interested Party Oscar Valdivia filed by Interested Party Oscar Valdivia. (Arana, Victor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 CLAIM filed by claimant Interested Party Jesus Tirado filed by Interested Party Jesus Tirado. (Arana, Victor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 CLAIM filed by claimant Plaintiff David Luis Cruz-Medina filed by Plaintiff David Luis Cruz-Medina. (Arana, Victor)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MARSHAL Return executed party served David Luis Cruz-Medina, Type of return complaint and notice, (JMC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Jose Angel Cabrera-Pinedo, Type of return complaint and notice, (JMC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Michael M. Felix, (JMC)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Interested Party Oscar Valdivia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(JMC) filed by Oscar Valdivia ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/2019. (JMC)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Interested Party Jesus Tirado. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(JMC) filed by Jesus Tirado ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/2019. (JMC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Interested Party Oscar Valdivia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JMC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Interested Party Jesus Tirado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JMC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed party served $15,080 U.S. Currency on 2/22/19, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, USMS custody date of 10/12/2018, deposited into SADF via OTCNet on 10/12/2018. (CSG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed party served $73,460.00 U.S. Currency on 2/22/19, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, USMS custody date of 10/12/18, deposited into SADF via OTCNet on 10/12/18. (CSG)
February 19, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
February 19, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendants $15,080.00 U.S. Currency, $73,460.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For $73,460.00, #4 Warrant For $15,080.00)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $73,460.00 U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $73,460.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,080.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Luis Cruz-Medina
Represented By: Victor Arturo Arana, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oscar Valdivia
Represented By: Victor Arturo Arana, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jesus Tirado
Represented By: Victor Arturo Arana, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?