Hirsty v. Med Weight and Wellness Center, LLC

Plaintiff: Craig Hirsty
Defendant: Med Weight and Wellness Center, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00249
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (CLO)
March 19, 2019 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Craig Hirsty to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
March 13, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Craig Hirsty to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (BAK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Craig Hirsty Process Server: Missouri Process Serving (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Med Weight and Wellness Center, LLC with receipt number 0865-7046303, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Craig Hirsty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsty v. Med Weight and Wellness Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Weight and Wellness Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hirsty
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?