Nichols v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Rechelle Nichols
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00273
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 6:18-cv-03354. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
February 21, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion to Transfer. After reviewing the record before the Court, the Court hereby Orders that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for order to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jerry L. Short added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Short, Jerry)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Defendant is granted an extension of time to file an answer in this case up to and including one week or seven days after legislation is enacted funding the Department of Justice and furloughed employees to return to work. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 11/5/2018 Social security answer due by 1/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 2/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: US Atty 11/5/18; ORC 11/5/18; Atty General 11/15/18)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 1, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Signed on 10/26/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Rechelle Nichols. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMOWDC-6004686) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Rechelle Nichols. Service due by 1/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Rechelle Nichols(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rechelle Nichols
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jerry L. Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?