Doe v. Washington University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Washington University
Case Number: 4:2019cv00300
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion to proceed anonymously Doc. #3 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 4/2/19. (ARL)
March 20, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order filed by Defendant Washington University. (Pake, Lisa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 23 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff John Doe, Defendant Washington University. (ARL)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Washington University. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: 6188 McPherson, LLC, Arch Personalized Medicine Initiative, LLC, Arch to Park Equity Fund, LLC, BioSTL, BJC Institute of Health at Washington University School of Medicine Condominium Asso., C2N Diagnostics, LLC, Campus Integration South Condominium Asso., Castlereagh ML, LLC, Castlereagh MT, LLC, Center of Research, Technology and Entrepreneurial Expertise, Clayton Euclid ML, LLC, Clayton Euclid, MT, LLC, Consortium for Graduate Studies in Management, Crescent, ML, LLC, Crescent MT, LLC, DVA/Washington University Healthcare Services of Greater St. Louis, LLC, Eastgate ML, LLC, Eastgate MT, LLC, Exegy, Inc. (f/k/a Data Search Systems, Inc.), Forest West Properties, Inc., Gateway Higher Education Cybersecurity Consortium, IITB-WUSTL Research and Educational Academy, International Pediatric Nutrition Alliance, Kingman Redevelopment Corp., McPherson Master Tenant, LLC, Midwest Lithotripsy, LLC, Midwest Surgical Technologies, LLC, Molecular Biology Consortium, NDFY14 Master Tenant, LLC, North Delmar FY14, LLC, Pinnacle Consortium of Higher Education, SKDB FY14, LLC, SKDB MT, LLC, St. Louis Internet2 Access Consortium, LLC, St. Louis Land Company, LLC, Telecommunications Facilities Corp., The Children's Discovery Institute, The Heart Care Institute Affiliated Services, LLC, The Heart Care Institute, LLC, University Reciprocal Manager, LLC, VelociData, Inc., Washington University Medical Center, Washington University Medical Center Redevelopment Corp., Washington University Physician Network, Inc., William Greenleaf Eliot Seed Fund, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Pake, Lisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Covert, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order by Plaintiff John Doe. (Covert, John)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to unseal certain documents [Doc. #16 ] is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 3/13/2019. (NEP)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Doe Washington University waiver signed on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Covert, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Clarify February 26, 2019 Order filed by Defendant Washington University. (Pake, Lisa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Clarify February 26, 2019 Order by Plaintiff John Doe. (Covert, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT Complaint by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USAIB Procedure, #2 Exhibit USCC, #3 Exhibit Law School Acceptance Letter, #4 Exhibit Jane's Complaint, #5 Exhibit April 20, 2018 Letter, #6 Exhibit Investigator's Report, #7 Exhibit Jane's Response to Report, #8 Exhibit John's Response to Report, #9 Exhibit Jane's Supplemental Response, #10 Exhibit DR and MK test messages, #11 Exhibit Jane's Exhibits for Panel Interview, #12 Exhibit Summary of Panel Interviews, #13 Exhibit CS Panel Interview, #14 Exhibit VO Panel Interview, #15 Exhibit OM Panel Interview, #16 Exhibit Jane Roe Panel Interview, #17 Exhibit John Doe Panel Interview, #18 Exhibit OM Panel Interview (2), #19 Exhibit DR Panel Interview, #20 Exhibit Panel's Decision, #21 Exhibit Sanction Letter, #22 Exhibit John's Request for Reconsideration, #23 Exhibit Letter Denying John's Appeal, #24 Exhibit Text Message between Jane and DR, #25 Exhibit Title IX Resources for Accused, #26 Exhibit Photos from April 26, 2018 protest, #27 Exhibit Not a Threat Op-ed, #28 Exhibit My heart sank because Op-ed, #29 Exhibit Three weeks later Op-ed, #30 Exhibit Improving Response to Sexual Assault, #31 Exhibit 2017 Dear Colleague Letter, #32 Exhibit 2017 FIRE due process study, #33 Exhibit Sexual Assault Advisory Committee, #34 Exhibit 2019 Letter, #35 Exhibit Washington University OCR Investigations, #36 Exhibit Panel member bias)(Covert, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER of Service issued defendantWashington University. sent to monica.allen@wustl.edu on 02/22/2019 filed by John Doe. Waiver of Service due by 4/24/2019. (Covert, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 COMPLAINT John Doe against defendant Washington University Jury Demand,, filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filling Form, #3 Exhibit USAIB Procedure, #4 Exhibit USCC Student Code, #5 Exhibit Law School Acceptance Letter, #6 Exhibit Jane Doe's Complaint, #7 Exhibit April 20, 2018 Letter, #8 Exhibit Investigator's Final Report, #9 Exhibit Jane's Response, #10 Exhibit John Doe's Response, #11 Exhibit Jane's Supplemental Response, #12 Exhibit DR and MK text messages, #13 Exhibit Jane's Panel Interview Exhibits, #14 Exhibit Summary of Panel Interviews, #15 Exhibit CS Panel Interview, #16 Exhibit VO Panel Interview, #17 Exhibit OM Panel Interview (1), #18 Exhibit Jane Roe Panel Interview, #19 Exhibit John Doe Panel Interview, #20 Exhibit OM Panel Interview (2), #21 Exhibit DR Panel Interview, #22 Exhibit Panel's Decision, #23 Exhibit Sanction Letter, #24 Exhibit John's Request for Reconsideration, #25 Exhibit Letter Denying John's Appeal, #26 Exhibit Text message between Jane Roe and DR, #27 Exhibit Title IX resources for men accused, #28 Exhibit Photos from April 26, 2018 protest, #29 Exhibit Not a Threat Op-ed, #30 Exhibit My heart sank because Op-ed, #31 Exhibit Three weeks later Op-ed, #32 Exhibit Improving Washington University's Response, #33 Exhibit 2017 Dear Colleague Letter, #34 Exhibit 2017 FIRE Study on due process, #35 Exhibit Sexual Assault Advisory Committee, #36 Exhibit Lori White's 2019 letter, #37 Exhibit OCR Investigates Washington University, #38 Exhibit Panel member's comments, #39 Form Disclosure of Organizational Interests)(Covert, John)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall disable the link to Document 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall refile his complaint and attached exhibits under seal. In naming his exhibits, plaintiff is directed to use the initials of nonparties rather than their names. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 2/26/2019. (NEP)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to seal documents #9 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/26/2019. (LXC)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Document Motion of Defendant Washington University to Seal Certain Pleadings and Docket Entries by Defendant Washington University. (Martin, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew Ambrose Martin for Defendant Washington University. (Martin, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa A. Pake for Defendant Washington University. (Pake, Lisa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Haar for Defendant Washington University. (Haar, Robert)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #2 MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint,,,,,,, Exhibits to Complaint 7-28 by Plaintiff John Doe. (Covert, John) filed by John Doe ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 2/25/2019. (NEP)
February 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff John Doe. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Plaintiff John Doe. (Covert, John) Modified on 2/25/2019 to correct docketing event used (JWD).
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint,,,,,,, Exhibits to Complaint 7-28 by Plaintiff John Doe. (Covert, John)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT John Doe against defendant Washington University with receipt number 0865-7054615, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by John Doe. Modified on 2/25/2019 (JWD).Clerk's note: Attorney docketed intended sealed documents incorrectly by not using the "Sealed Document" category. Docket entry sealed pending plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File under seal filed as docket entry #2 . ,DOCUMENT REMOVED PER CHAMBERS Modified on 2/26/2019 (NEP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Washington University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington University
Represented By: Lisa A. Pake
Represented By: Robert T. Haar
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: John Galt Covert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?