Kurz v. United States
Plaintiff: John M. Kurz
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 4:2019cv00310
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6212
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 PRO SE MOTION And Affidavit For Emergency Order filed by Plaintiff John M. Kurz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MRC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 PRO SE MOTION And Affidavit For Emergency Order filed by Defendant United States. (Aberg, Eric)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric Martin Aberg for Defendant United States. (Aberg, Eric)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION And Affidavit For Emergency Order by Plaintiff John M. Kurz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John M. Kurz. Defendant United States served by serving William Barr,U.S. Attorney General on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (MRC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John M. Kurz. Defendant United States served by serving U.S. Attorney on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (MRC)
February 25, 2019 Receipt 4644078088 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of John M. Kurz (CCAM)
February 25, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Feb 25 17:01:11 CST 2019 (admin,)
February 25, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
February 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was hand delivered to plaintiff John M. Kurz. Judge Assigned: Honorable Charles A. Shaw. (JWD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United States, Non-Jury Demand, filed by John M. Kurz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Tax Court Order of Dismissal, #2 Exhibit B - US Tax Court Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit C - US Tax Court Supplement to Respondent's Motion, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Summons Attorney General, #7 Summons US Attorney)(JWD)Clerk's note: Exhibit C sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurz v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Eric Martin Aberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?