Scott v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Linda Scott
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00399
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by the US Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/21/2019, by serving the US Attorney General. (JMC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by the U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/19/2019, by serving the Social Security Administration. (JMC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed the U.S. Marshals Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/15/2019, by serving the U.S. Attorney, answer due 5/14/2019. (JMC)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Linda Scott. (JMC)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
March 5, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendants Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal's Office, St. Louis. (JMC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, administrative Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/25/2019. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (see order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/4/19. (MRS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/4/19. (MRS)
March 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (BAK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Linda Scott. (BAK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Linda Scott. (Kohl, Donald)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Linda Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Commissioner of SSA, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Kohl, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Scott
Represented By: Donald L. Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?