Schmaltz v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Angela D. Schmaltz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00414
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Angela D. Schmaltz. (AAS)
April 5, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Angela D. Schmaltz to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/12/2019. (KJS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela D. Schmaltz. Defendant SSA Office of General Counsel served on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (AAS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela D. Schmaltz. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (AAS)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (CLA)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshals Service. (KJS)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). (See order for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/7/19. (KJS)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/7/19. (KJS)
March 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Angela D. Schmaltz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela D. Schmaltz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial CJA23)(Severs, Traci)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Angela D. Schmaltz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Nancy Berryhhill, #5 Summons Jeffrey Jensen)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmaltz v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D. Schmaltz
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?