Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc. v. City of Silex, Missouri
Plaintiff: Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc.
Defendant: City of Silex, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2019cv00538
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER... Status Conference set for 8/1/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/2019. (NEP)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on June 27, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in my chambers. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/17/19. (KEK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant City of Silex, Missouri. (Guinness, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant City of Silex, Missouri. (Guinness, Robert) filed by City of Silex, Missouri ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/30/2019. (NEP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant City of Silex, Missouri. (Guinness, Robert)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant City of Silex, Missouri. (Guinness, Robert) filed by City of Silex, Missouri; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/23/19. (KEK)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant City of Silex, Missouri. (Guinness, Robert)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Guinness for Defendant City of Silex, Missouri. (Guinness, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc.. Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return of Service)(Hale, Larry)
March 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Larry Hale. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc. Process Server: Pro Serve (BAK)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (BAK)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant City of Silex, Missouri with receipt number 0865-7103010, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Form Required forms)(Hale, Larry) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/20/2019) (BAK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2019: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (BAK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2019: #8 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc. v. City of Silex, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutri-Ject Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Silex, Missouri
Represented By: Robert J. Guinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?