Quartey v. Express Scripts, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Philip Quartey
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc., Timothy M Shoemaker and Timothy M. Shoemaker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00552
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed as to Defendant Timothy M. Shoemaker for failure to execute timely service in compliance with Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 4(m). Show Cause Response due by 7/17/2019.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 07/03/2019. (AAS)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Express Scripts, Inc..(Owings, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Philip Quartey.(MFG)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts, Inc... (Owings, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric A. Todd for Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.. (Todd, Eric)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Express Scripts, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Owings, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua S. Owings for Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.. (Owings, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County MO, case number 19SL-CC00516, with receipt number 0865-7108588, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A. State Court File)(Owings, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quartey v. Express Scripts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Represented By: Joshua S. Owings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Quartey
Represented By: Richard J. Magee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?