Dogra v. CAA Sports LLC
Plaintiff: Ben Dogra
Defendant: CAA Sports LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00859
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - correspondence from Arbitrator)(Comerford, John)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT - For the reasons stated in the accompanying Order and Memorandum, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the parties are compelled to arbitrate this dispute, as requested by plaintiff's petition. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on June 4, 2019. (MCB)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Petition to Compel Arbitration #1 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall request that the case be returned to Arbitrator M. David Vaughn for completion of the resolution of their dispute. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on June 4, 2019. (MCB)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM (Jointly Submitted) by Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Comerford, John)
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Catherine D. Perry: In Court Hearing held on 5/3/2019. Oral argument from both sides heard by the Court regarding the complaint/petition. Parties to file a joint exhibit letter by 5:00 pm on 5/3/19. Matter taken under submission. (Court Reporter:Gayle Madden, Gayle_Madden@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7987) (proceedings started: 9:02 am) (proceedings ended: 9:56 am)(Deputy Clerk: E. Brown)(Appearance for Plaintiff: John Comerford, James Martin, Robert Lattinville)(Appearance for Defendant: Charles Jellinek, Guy Brenner) (EAB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Erik O. Solverud for Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Solverud, Erik)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Henry Lattinville for Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Lattinville, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony J. Oncidi by Defendant CAA Sports LLC. and #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Guy Brenner by Defendant CAA Sports LLC ; ORDERED : Motions are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 2, 2019. (MCB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CAA Sports LLC.(Jellinek, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony J. Oncidi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7184895) by Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oncidi, Anthony)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Guy Brenner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7184847) by Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brenner, Guy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles B. Jellinek for Defendant CAA Sports LLC. (Jellinek, Charles)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for hearing #6 is granted, and the Court will hear the Petition to Compel Arbitration on Friday, May 3, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Courtroom 14-South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because no counsel has entered an appearance for defendant but plaintiff's counsel has indicated that defense counsel has agreed to this hearing date, plaintiff's counsel must immediately serve defense counsel with a copy of this Order as well as with a copy of the motion for hearing, as that motion only indicates that it was served by the Court's electronic case filing system, which, of course, does not serve anyone who has not entered an appearance. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/17/19. (EAB)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Comerford, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ben Dogra Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (Comerford, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by James B. Martin for Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Martin, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Comerford for Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Comerford, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Plaintiff Ben Dogra. (Bennett, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Arbitration against defendant CAA Sports LLC with receipt number 0865-7138012, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Ben Dogra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Summons)(Comerford, John)
April 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney John D. Comerford. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dogra v. CAA Sports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAA Sports LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Oncidi
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Dogra
Represented By: John D. Comerford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James B. Martin
Represented By: Robert Henry Lattinville
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?