Zeavision, LLC v. MacuHealth Limited Partnership

Plaintiff: Zeavision, LLC
Defendant: MacuHealth LP and MacuHealth Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2019cv00893
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF REMAND IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/12/19. cc: City(CLA)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Remand (ECF No. 14) is GRANTED. #14 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/12/19. (CLA)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill) filed by Zeavision, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 5/23/19. (KJS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Robert Kearns Affidavit)(Rembusch, Jill)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Frederic Jouhet)(Samuels, Joel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joel Samuels, #2 Exhibit A - St. Louis Business Journal Article, #3 Exhibit B - SEC Form D, #4 Exhibit C - EyePromise Website)(Samuels, Joel)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Samuels, Joel) filed by MacuHealth Limited Partnership ; ORDERED GRANTED.( Response to Court due by 5/14/2019.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 05/06/2019. (AAS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Samuels, Joel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Rembusch, Jill)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Andreas Wolf Affidavit)(Rembusch, Jill)
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill) filed by Zeavision, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 4/30/2019.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 04/30/2019. (AAS)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Glenn E. Forbis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7160845) by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Forbis, Glenn) filed by MacuHealth Limited Partnership, #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill) filed by Zeavision, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 04/19/2019. (AAS)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Zeavision, LLC. (Rembusch, Jill)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Glenn E. Forbis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7160845) by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Forbis, Glenn)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Frederic Jouhet, #2 Exhibit B - TESS Printout of US Application 85/539468)(Samuels, Joel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Samuels, Joel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant MacuHealth Limited Partnership Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Stamped Notice of Removal)(Samuels, Joel)
April 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Zeavision, LLC.(MFG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant MacuHealth LP Sent To: Plaintiff (Samuels, Joel)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant MacuHealth LP.. (Samuels, Joel)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC00793, with receipt number 0865-7139241, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by MacuHealth LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File and Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Jouhet Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Samuels, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeavision, LLC v. MacuHealth Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeavision, LLC
Represented By: Jill R. Rembusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacuHealth LP
Represented By: Joel R. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacuHealth Limited Partnership
Represented By: Glenn Eric Forbis
Represented By: Joel R. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?