Church Mutual Insurance Company v. The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis
Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis
Case Number: 4:2019cv00903
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/26/19. (CSG)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis of Count 2 of Defendant's Counterclaim (Molner, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Defendant's Second Counterclaim for Breach of Common Law Good Faith and Fair Dealing filed by Plaintiff Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Cockerham, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss :Defendant's Second Counterclaim for Breach of Common Law Good Faith and Fair Dealing by Plaintiff Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Cockerham, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Church Mutual Insurance Company.(Cockerham, Robert)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Church Mutual Insurance Company by The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis.(Molner, Mark)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis served on 4/28/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Cockerham, Robert)
April 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert W. Cockerham. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Church Mutual Insurance Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Cockerham, Robert)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Church Mutual Insurance Company Process Server: Dennis Dahlberg (Cockerham, Robert)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against defendant The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis with receipt number 0865-7142936, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #6 Summons Summons)(Cockerham, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Mutual Insurance Company v. The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W. Cockerham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Christian Worship Center of St. Louis
Represented By: Mark D. Molner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?