Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. S & C Concrete, LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund and Steve Schrimpf
Defendant: S & C Concrete, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01187
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant shall submit to a payroll examination covering the period of January 1, 2016 through the present date, including Defendants business books, records, ledgers, and any other documents pertaining to compensation paid to, hours worked by, monies withheld from, and taxes paid on account of employees and any additional records or documents relevant to the total number of hours worked and/or paid to employees within the jurisdiction of the collective bargaining agreements and Trust Agreements for the two trust funds named in Plaintiffs complaint.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 06/28/2019. (AAS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (EAB)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign the instant cause of action to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 6/26/19. (EAB)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant S & C Concrete, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant S & C Concrete, LLC #7 is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (Order sent to address used for service this date.) (CBL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 6/17/2019 (EAB).
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Sollars, Bradley)
June 4, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/8/2019. (EAB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Schrimpf, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Patrick Pryor, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn. All Defendants Answer due 6/13/19. (Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 6/4/2019 (EAB).
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Bradley J. Sollars. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf re #1 Complaint, (Sollars, Bradley)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant S & C Concrete, LLC with receipt number 0865-7191314, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Steve Schrimpf, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Patrick Pryor, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Sollars, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. S & C Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Glenn
Represented By: Bradley J. Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pryor
Represented By: Bradley J. Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Bradley J. Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Bradley J. Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Schrimpf
Represented By: Bradley J. Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & C Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?