Duffy v. Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Duffy
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01189
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christian J. Pistilli. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7305724) by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Pistilli, Christian) filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ravi Doshi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7305773) by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Doshi, Ravi) filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert S. Newman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7305753) by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Newman, Robert) filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/1/19. (KEK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE Request for Oral Argument: by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC re #18 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint (Bennett, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Bennett, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ravi Doshi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7305773) by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Doshi, Ravi)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert S. Newman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7305753) by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Newman, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christian J. Pistilli. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7305724) by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Pistilli, Christian)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Needham., #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Izard., #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark P. Kindall., #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth R. Klein. filed by Michael Duffy ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/2019. (NEP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Needham. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7300241) by Plaintiff Michael Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Douglas P. Needham)(Needham, Douglas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth R. Klein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7300210) by Plaintiff Michael Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Seth R. Klein)(Klein, Seth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2019) (KEK).
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark P. Kindall. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7300187) by Plaintiff Michael Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Mark P. Kindall)(Kindall, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Izard. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7300150) by Plaintiff Michael Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Robert A. Izard)(Izard, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion for extension of briefing schedule [ #6 ] is granted, and defendant shall be granted an extension of time, up to and including June 28, 2019, to file a responsive pleading, including a motion to dismiss, to the complaint. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to any motion to dismiss no later than August 16, 2019, and defendant may file a reply brief in support of any motion to dismiss no later than September 20, 2019. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/30/2019. (NEP)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings (KXS)
May 28, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, Plaintiff Michael Duffy to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (AFC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. Parent companies: Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: Anheuser-Busch InBev NV/SA.,. (Bennett, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule by Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip Allen Cantwell for Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Cantwell, Philip)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC. (Bennett, James)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Mark G. Boyko. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michael Duffy Process Server: Same Day Processing/Martin Hueckel (Boyko, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC with receipt number 0865-7191950, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(Boyko, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Duffy
Represented By: Mark G. Boyko
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Represented By: Robert A Izard, Jr
Represented By: Seth R. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
Represented By: Ravi Doshi
Represented By: Christian J. Pistilli
Represented By: Philip Allen Cantwell
Represented By: Robert S. Newman
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?