Sharkey v. Ascension Health Alliance

Plaintiff: Robin Sharkey
Defendant: Ascension Health Alliance
Case Number: 4:2019cv01198
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #2 , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by attorney Evan Sanford on behalf of Plaintiff Robin Sharkey; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on June 6, 2019. (LL)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Evan Sanford. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number BMOEDC-7259258) by Plaintiff Robin Sharkey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of good standing)(Sanford, Evan)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Ascension Health Alliance d/b/a Ascension Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Robin Sharkey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Plan, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Waiver of Service of Summons)(Mandel, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharkey v. Ascension Health Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Health Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Sharkey
Represented By: Alan S. Mandel
Represented By: Evan M. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?