Gleich v. City of Calverton Park

Plaintiff: Jeremy Gleich
Defendant: City of Calverton Park and City of Calverton Park, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2019cv01303
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeremy Gleich City of Calverton Park, Missouri waiver signed on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Rechenberg, Paul)
May 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Paul Rechenberg. Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jeremy Gleich (Rechenberg, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2019 (MFG). Summons
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jeremy Gleich (Rechenberg, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2019 (MFG). Civil Cover Sheet
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jeremy Gleich (Rechenberg, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2019 (MFG). Original Filing Form
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Jeremy Gleich. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Rechenberg, Paul)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jeremy Gleich Process Server: Dennis Dahlberg (Rechenberg, Paul)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant City of Calverton Park with receipt number 0865-7207245, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jeremy Gleich.(Rechenberg, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gleich v. City of Calverton Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Gleich
Represented By: Paul N. Rechenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Calverton Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Calverton Park, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?