Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Gleeson Asphalt, Inc.
Plaintiff: AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Patrick R. Pryor, Lou Grasse, Steve MacDonald, Joe Hoette, John Smith, Jr., Richard McLaughlin, Joe Scarfino, Ronny Griffin, Terry Briggs, Phil Hocher, Michael Luth, Brandon Flinn, Donald Willey, Cliff Land, David A. Gillick, Doug Wachsnicht, Brad Grant, Michael Lutz, Matt Andrews, Gary Elliott, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Richard McGuire, Corey Black, Perri Pryor, Joseph Leritz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Jeffrey O'Connell, Frank Marchesi, William L. Luth, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis and Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Defendant: Gleeson Asphalt, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01304
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Richard McGuire, Brandon Flinn, Lou Grasse, Donald Willey, David A. Gillick(Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis), Ronny Griffin, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Perri Pryor, Richard McLaughlin, William L. Luth, AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Patrick R. Pryor, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Gary Elliott, Joe Hoette, Brad Grant, Michael Luth, Michael Lutz, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Robert Bieg, Jr., John Smith, Jr, Joe Scarfino, Matt Andrews, David A. Gillick, Corey Black, Jeffrey O'Connell, Terry Briggs, Frank Marchesi, Steve MacDonald, Phil Hocher, Cliff Land. Gleeson Asphalt, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Martin, Janine)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Janine M. Martin. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Matt Andrews, Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, David A. Gillick, David A. Gillick, Brad Grant, Lou Grasse, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Ronny Griffin, Phil Hocher, Joe Hoette, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Michael Luth, William L. Luth, Michael Lutz, Steve MacDonald, Frank Marchesi, Richard McGuire, Richard McLaughlin, Richard McLaughlin, Jeffrey O'Connell, Patrick R. Pryor, Perri Pryor, Joe Scarfino, John Smith, Jr, Doug Wachsnicht, Donald Willey, Donald Willey, Donald Willey Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc (Martin, Janine)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gleeson Asphalt, Inc. with receipt number 0865-7207635, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Richard McGuire, Brandon Flinn, Lou Grasse, Donald Willey, David A. Gillick(Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis), Ronny Griffin, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Perri Pryor, Richard McLaughlin, William L. Luth, AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Patrick R. Pryor, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Gary Elliott, Joe Hoette, Brad Grant, Michael Luth, Michael Lutz, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Robert Bieg, Jr., John Smith, Jr, Joe Scarfino, Matt Andrews, David A. Gillick, Corey Black, Jeffrey O'Connell, Terry Briggs, Frank Marchesi, Steve MacDonald, Phil Hocher, Cliff Land. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #2 Original Filing Form Attachment, #3 Summons Attachment)(Martin, Janine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Gleeson Asphalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick R. Pryor
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Grasse
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve MacDonald
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hoette
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Scarfino
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Griffin
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Briggs
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Hocher
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Luth
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Willey
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Land
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Gillick
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wachsnicht
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Grant
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lutz
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Andrews
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Elliott
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Black
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perri Pryor
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bieg, Jr.
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Connell
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marchesi
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Luth
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleeson Asphalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?