Ortho Solutions, LC v. Sanchez
Plaintiff: Ortho Solutions, LC d/b/a DynaFlex and Ortho Solutions, LC
Defendant: Eric Sanchez
Case Number: 4:2019cv01307
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 ***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 8:19-cv-01179 (KXS)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: Notice of voluntary dismissal. Filed. SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/17/19. (CLA) Modified on 6/20/2019 (CLA).COPY OF DISMISSAL/DOCKET SHEET FORWARDED TO CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA.
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ortho Solutions, LC (Jacober, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, [Doc. No. 14] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. No. 6] remains pending for consideration by the Transferee Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, Southern Division. #14 #6 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/12/19. (CLA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Eric Sanchez. (Comerford, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC. (Jacober, Matthew) Modified on 6/4/2019 (CLA).
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC. (Jacober, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 CLERKS WITNESS LIST as to TRO hearing. (CLA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 CLERKS Exhibit List to the TRO hearing. (CLA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey: In Court Hearing held on 5/29/2019. TRO; testimony heard, mtn. taken under submission. Mtn. to dismiss #14; heard; Pltff. granted leave to file response to mtn. by the close of business on 5/31/19; mtn. taken under submission. Exhibits 1 - 3 admitted. (Court Reporter:Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966) (proceedings started: 2:00) (proceedings ended: 3:40)(Deputy Clerk: cla)(Appearance for Plaintiff: M. Jacober)(Appearance for Defendant: J. Comerford) (CLA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Eric Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Sanchez)(Comerford, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Eric Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Sanchez)(Comerford, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Transfer Venue by Defendant Eric Sanchez. (Comerford, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Comerford for Defendant Eric Sanchez. (Comerford, John)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for Wednesday, May 29, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10N before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 05/20/2019. (AAS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL) - The above styled and numbered case was opened on May 14, 2019. The case was assigned to the Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on May 15, 2019. Thereafter, on May 16, 2019, the plaintiff filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order requesting a hearing on Thursday, May 23, 2019. The case must therefore be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Henry E. Autrey, United States District Judge. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (MRC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Jacober, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC. (Jacober, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC.. (Jacober, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC. (Jacober, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC. (Jacober, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Danielle N. Twait for Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC. (Twait, Danielle)
May 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Matthew A. Jacober. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC Process Server: Express Network (BAK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober for Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC d/b/a DynaFlex. (Jacober, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ortho Solutions, LC d/b/a DynaFlex. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted))(Jacober, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Eric Sanchez with receipt number 0865-7208190, in the amount of $400, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Ortho Solutions, LC d/b/a DynaFlex. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Original Filing Form , #11 Summons )(Jacober, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortho Solutions, LC v. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortho Solutions, LC d/b/a DynaFlex
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortho Solutions, LC
Represented By: Danielle N. Twait
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sanchez
Represented By: John D. Comerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?