Cook v. State Collection Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle Cook
Defendant: State Collection Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01308
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall file, no later than September 6, 2019, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 9/6/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/9/19. (KKS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Michelle Cook (LaCroix, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Collection Service, Inc..(Watts, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick A. Watts for Defendant State Collection Service, Inc.. (Watts, Patrick)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michelle Cook. State Collection Service, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (LaCroix, Anthony)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Anthony E. LaCroix. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michelle Cook Process Server: Eastern Missouri Legal Services (BAK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Michelle Cook. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (LaCroix, Anthony)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant State Collection Service, Inc. with receipt number 0865-7208216, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Michelle Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 4, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - October 22, 2018 Letter, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(LaCroix, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. State Collection Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cook
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Collection Service, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?