Allport v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Keith Allport
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01396
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Keith Allport. (CLA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
May 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USM. (CLA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: administrative. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/22/19. (CLA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. #2 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/22/19. (CLA)
May 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Keith Allport. (BAK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keith Allport. (Overton, Kathleen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Keith Allport. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Office of Regional Counsel, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allport v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Allport
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?