Baughman, Jr. v. Lowe's Home Improvement Store
Plaintiff: Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.
Defendant: Lowe's Home Improvement Store
Case Number: 4:2019cv01398
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed Jul 10 15:02:01 CDT 2019 (Bernsen, John)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/10/19. (JAB)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mon Jul 8 14:53:32 CDT 2019 (Schaefer, Michelle)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy) filed by Lowe's Home Improvement Store ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/8/19. (MRS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.. (MRS)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Thu May 30 13:42:53 CDT 2019 (Gould, Cathy)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (#4) is DENIED without prejudice at this time. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/30/19. (CSG)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Improvement Store.(Schrag, Jeremy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. Parent companies: Lowe's Cos. Inc.,. (Schrag, Jeremy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store Sent To: State Court - Executed (Schrag, Jeremy)
May 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.. (BAK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr..(BAK)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Filed Notice of Removal with Exhibits)(Schrag, Jeremy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-CC00682, with receipt number 0865-7225748, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Schrag, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baughman, Jr. v. Lowe's Home Improvement Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Improvement Store
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?