Zamardzic v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Sead Zamardzic
Defendant: Ann Marie Jordan-Starks and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 4:2019cv01405
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Docket Text ORDER: On review of the file, the Court notifies plaintiff's counsel that every exhibit to any document that is filed must be labeled with both an exhibit designation and a brief description of the exhibit. See Section II.F. of the Courts Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing/Case Management. The instructions that appear in red text on the filing screens reiterate this requirement. Plaintiff failed to follow these instructions and did not label the exhibits to the complaint with descriptions. Plaintiff filed a separate Exhibit List that identifies the exhibits, but this does not comply with the Court's Administrative Procedures. In the future, any document that does not comply with this requirement will be stricken for filing error. The Clerk of the Court is requested to modify the docket text to describe the complaint's exhibits, in accordance with plaintiff's Exhibit List (Doc. 1, Ex. 5). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on May 24, 2019. (SMH)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL Summons for Mr. Barr, Mr. Jensen, Mr. McAleenan and Ms. Jordan by Plaintiff Sead Zamardzic. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ituarte, Jesus)
May 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Jesus Ituarte. Judge Assigned: Honorable Charles A. Shaw. (JWD)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 4:19-cv-1405 against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-7228925, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Sead Zamardzic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet form, #2 Original Filing Form original filing form, #3 Summons summons for defendant 2, #4 Summons summons for defendant 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit list, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Seatbelt violation 3/21/2013 #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Proposed finding of fact and conclusion of law for Driving While Intoxicated Citation, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Stop Sign violation 4/12/2014, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Seatbelt violation 01/17/2015)(Ituarte, Jesus) Clerk's note: attached summonses did not include addresses of defendants or plaintiff attorney information. Filer has requested correct summonses for all applicable parties as docket entry #2 .Additionally, Exhibit #4 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers. Modified on 5/23/2019 (JWD). [Docket text entry modified per the Court's Docket Text Order no. 3 Modified on 5/24/2019 (MRC).]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamardzic v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sead Zamardzic
Represented By: Jesus G. Ituarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Jordan-Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?