Meyers v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Clifford Meyers
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01522
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/6/2019 through the U.S. Attorney's office, answer due 8/5/2019. (CSG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Clifford Meyers. (CSG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
May 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to USM St Louis. (MRS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Clifford Meyers.. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/20/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/30/19. (CSG)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ #2] isGRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/30/19. (CSG)
May 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (MFG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Clifford Meyers. (MFG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clifford Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Clifford Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Meyers
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?