Saddler v. Carvana, LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Saddler
Defendant: Carvana, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01646
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: CASE REMANDED TO ST. LOUIS COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT; SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/18/19. cc: STL. Co,(CLA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey: In Court Hearing held on 6/18/2019. Motion for remand argued and Granted. (Court Reporter:Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989) (proceedings started: 10:30) (proceedings ended: 10:40)(Deputy Clerk: cla)(Appearance for Plaintiff: R. Saddler - pro se)(Appearance for Defendant: M. McFarland) (CLA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE Filing: by Defendant Carvana, LLC of Filing Declaration of Grace DeJohn (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Grace DeJohn)(McFarland, Marshall)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - RIC & Security Agreement)(Brasher, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Brasher, William)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Thomas McFarland. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7262594) by Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing re T. McFarland)(McFarland, Marshall) filed by Carvana, LLC ; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/13/19. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Carvana, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Brasher, William)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for June 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/10/19. (KJS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE - At the direction of the Court Plaintiff Richard T. Saddler's email address as indicated on Doc. 1-2 has been entered into this record. Plaintiff must complete and file the attached Eastern District of Missouri Request By Non-Prisoner Self-Represented Party For Electronic Noticing. (MRC)
June 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER [COPY AS ENTERED IN ST. LOUIS COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT]: Plaintiff's motion for TRO set for hearing June 18th, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Stanley Wallach of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri on 5/24/19. (JWD)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER [COPY AS ENTERED IN ST. LOUIS COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT]: Plaintiff's Motion for TRO called and argued. Court find that defendant was not given proper notice of the hearing in Division 17 which issued the TRO dated on May 16, 2019 nor was defendant served with the TRO. Plaintiff's motion continued to date to be agreed by the parties. Signed by Judge Stanley Wallach of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, on 5/24/19. (JWD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Thomas McFarland. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7262594) by Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing re T. McFarland)(McFarland, Marshall)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph Walsh of the Circuit Court of St. Louis, County, Missouri on 5/16/19. (JWD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Motion for TRO, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Proposed TRO)(JWD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Richard Saddler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JWD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Richard Saddler. (JWD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Richard Saddler.(JWD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Allison Elizabeth Lee for Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Lee, Allison)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Carvana, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal)(Brasher, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Carvana, LLC. Parent companies: Carvana Group, LLC; Carvana Co. Sub, LLC, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Brasher, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by William A. Brasher for Defendant Carvana, LLC. (Brasher, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC01864, with receipt number AMOEDC-7261672, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Carvana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amount in Controversy Email, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Pending Motions in State Court, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Original Filing Form)(Brasher, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saddler v. Carvana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carvana, LLC
Represented By: William A. Brasher
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Lee
Represented By: Marshall Thomas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Saddler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?