Huye v. PRECC, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Antoine O. Huye
Defendant: Qual-Tek, Inc., PRECC, Inc. and Cable Boss Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01668
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED up to and including September 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 8/7/19. (THL)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Barry Y. Freeman for Defendants Cable Boss Corp., PRECC, Inc.. (Freeman, Barry)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Defendant Qual-Tek, Inc.. (Christman, Jonathan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan D Christman for Defendant Qual-Tek, Inc.. (Christman, Jonathan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin D. Dougherty for Defendant Qual-Tek, Inc.. (Dougherty, Colin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antoine O. Huye Cable Boss Corp. waiver signed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; PRECC, Inc. waiver signed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Karsh, Eli)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin D. Dougherty for Defendant Qual-Tek, Inc.. (Dougherty, Colin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antoine O. Huye Qual-Tek, Inc. waiver signed on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Karsh, Eli)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A. Potashnick for Plaintiff Antoine O. Huye. (Potashnick, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Eli Karsh. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Antoine O. Huye Process Server: United Processing (Attachments: #1 Summons PRECC, Inc., #2 Summons Cable Boss Corp., #3 Summons Qual-Tek, Inc.)(Karsh, Eli)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Antoine O. Huye. (Karsh, Eli)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Antoine O. Huye with receipt number AMOEDC-7270671, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Antoine O. Huye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Karsh, Eli)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huye v. PRECC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qual-Tek, Inc.
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Represented By: Jonathan D Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECC, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Y. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable Boss Corp.
Represented By: Barry Y. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine O. Huye
Represented By: Eli Karsh
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?