Wilson v. Gore al
Plaintiff: Pierre Wilson
Defendant: Bi-State Development Agency and Dawon Gore
Case Number: 4:2019cv01681
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: It is hereby ordered that #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is granted. All claims are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/9/19. (JAB)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pierre Wilson (Tate, Rufus)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: On June 18, 2019, Defendant Bi-State Development Agency filed a motion to dismiss #6 . This Court granted Plaintiff an extension of time of time through July 3, 2019, to file a response. Plaintiff has still not filed a response to the motion. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause by no later than August 2, 2019, why Defendant Bi-State Developments Agencys motion should not be granted. (Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/23/2019. (CLO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER/ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen R Clark for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Ross no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/18/19. (KKS)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Pierre Wilson. ( Response to Court due by 7/3/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/1/19. (KKS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Consent to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint (O'Keefe, Donald)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Pierre Wilson. (Tate, Rufus)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency. (O'Keefe, Donald)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency. (O'Keefe, Donald)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency Sent To: State Court - Executed (O'Keefe, Donald)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(O'Keefe, Donald)
June 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Petition. (JWD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Pierre Wilson.(JWD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19sl-ac12015, with receipt number AMOEDC-7272160, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bi-State Development Agency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Keefe, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Gore al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Wilson
Represented By: Rufus J. Tate, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-State Development Agency
Represented By: Donald L. O'Keefe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawon Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?