Eich v. Saul

Plaintiff: Ashton Eich
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01686
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed WILLIAM BARR US ATTORNEY GENERAL filed by Ashton Eich. (AAS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ashton Eich. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (AAS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ashton Eich. Defendant SSA Office of General Counsel served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (AAS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
June 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshals Service. (KJS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/14/19. (KJS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/14/19. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Ashton Eich. (BAK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ashton Eich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kohl, Donald)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Ashton Eich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons SSA, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Kohl, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eich v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Eich
Represented By: Donald L. Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?