Nekouee v. Serve All Hospitality LLC
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Serve All Hospitality LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01696
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/16/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/27/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/22/2019. (JMP)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Serve All Hospitality LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Serve All Hospitality LLC.(Morris, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by James C. Morris for Defendant Serve All Hospitality LLC. (Morris, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Serve All Hospitality LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Vincze, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Robert Joseph Vincze. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee Process Server: Eastern Missouri (Vincze, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Serve All Hospitality LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7277190, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. Serve All Hospitality LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serve All Hospitality LLC
Represented By: James C. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert Joseph Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?