Jackson v. I.C. System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tonnette Jackson
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01702
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Ronnie L. White no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (AAS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (AAS)
July 1, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant I.C. System, Inc., Plaintiff Tonnette Jackson to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/8/2019. (KCB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by I.C. System, Inc..(Watts, Patrick)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick A. Watts for Defendant I.C. System, Inc.. (Watts, Patrick)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant I.C. System, Inc.. Parent companies: None., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: None.,. (Watts, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Tonnette Jackson.(MFG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant I.C. SYSTEM, INC. Sent To: Plaintiff (Watts, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-AC06181, with receipt number BMOEDC-7279440, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by I.C. SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Watts, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. I.C. System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonnette Jackson
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?