Taylor v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Taylor
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01705
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(Smith, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the consent motion to continue [ #15 ] is GRANTED. The conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is reset from August 16, 2019 to August 29, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in my chambers, 16-South. The joint proposed scheduling plan is now due on or before August 22, 2019. Counsel are expected to appear in my chambers in person for the scheduling conference. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/22/2019., Rule 16 Conference set for 8/29/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/24/2019. (NEP)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Knepper, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is reset from Tuesday, August 13, 2019 to Friday, August 16, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in my chambers 16-South. The joint proposed scheduling plan is now due on or before August 9, 2019. Counsel are expected to appear in my chambers in person for the scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/19/19. (KEK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings (JMP)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including July 31, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on July 9, 2019. (HEH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon Alan Black for Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Black, Brandon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith for Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Smith, Christopher)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Knepper, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D. Knepper for Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Knepper, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/6/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/13/2019 01:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/25/19. (CLA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by John Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BAK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Request for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Respond) by Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Smith, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. Parent companies: Murphy USA, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Murphy USA, Inc.,. (Smith, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Smith, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC01713, with receipt number AMOEDC-7280030, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Taylor
Represented By: Robert Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A Smith
Represented By: Matthew D. Knepper
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Brandon Alan Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?