SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC v. Winston et al
Plaintiff: SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC
Defendant: Raymond Winston, Mike Ruff, City of Bel-Ridge and Cary Herndon
Case Number: 4:2019cv01712
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff ;attorney/firm Matthew T. Singer/Law Office of Matthew T. Singer by Plaintiff SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC. (Singer, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston, Raymond Winston. (Bates, Rachel)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston, Raymond Winston. (Bates, Rachel)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER/ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen R Clark for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Ross no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/18/19. (KKS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston, Raymond Winston. (Bates, Rachel) ; ORDERED GRANTED, City of Bel-Ridge answer due 7/24/2019; Cary Herndon answer due 7/24/2019; Mike Ruff answer due 7/24/2019; Raymond Winston(in his capacity as Building Commissioner of Bel-Ridge) answer due 7/24/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/25/19. (JAB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston, Raymond Winston. (Bates, Rachel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston, Raymond Winston Sent To: State Court - Executed (Bates, Rachel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Withdrawal of Hearing by Plaintiff SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC. (Singer, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew T. Singer for Plaintiff SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC. (Singer, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
June 19, 2019 ***REMARK: Plaintiff SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC, filed a petition and amended petition in state court that asks for a temporary restraining order and injuctive relief. Attorney for plaintiff, Kevin Webb, advised the Clerk's Office on 6/18/2019 that the plaintiff will not file a separate Motion for Temporary Restraining Order at present nor ask for a hearing on a TRO and that a different attorney at the firm who is admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri's bar will enter their appearance as counsel for plaintiff. Attorney directed by Clerk's Office to file a memorandum to the Court stating that no Motion for TRO or notice of immediate hearing will be sought by plaintiff at present. As of 6/19/2019 no memorandum has been filed. Clerk's Office to proceed with judge assignment. (JWD)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by William A. Hellmich for Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston, Raymond Winston. (Hellmich, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to attorney Kevin Steward Webb, II from Clerk Re:Admission To Practice (MFG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MFG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MFG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants City of Bel-Ridge, Cary Herndon, Mike Ruff, Raymond Winston Sent To: Plaintiff (Bates, Rachel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC01498, with receipt number AMOEDC-7282528, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Raymond Winston, Cary Herndon, City of Bel-Ridge, Mike Ruff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit 1: Complete State Court File, #4 Exhibit 2: Pending Motion to Stay)(Bates, Rachel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/18/2019) (MFG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #5 Origianl State Court Petition) (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC v. Winston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Winston
Represented By: Rachel A. Bates
Represented By: William A. Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ruff
Represented By: Rachel A. Bates
Represented By: William A. Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bel-Ridge
Represented By: Rachel A. Bates
Represented By: William A. Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Herndon
Represented By: Rachel A. Bates
Represented By: William A. Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM-T.E.H. Realty 1, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Steward Webb, II
Represented By: Matthew T. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?