Kick International Inc. v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Kick International Inc. d/b/a USMMAF and Kick International Inc.
Defendant: Fotini Kandris, Dr Ari Kramer, Jeffrey Roufus, Orlando Jimenez, Ralph Cook, Dominick Cruz, Justin Brown, Giorgio Boscolo and Ari Kramer, M.D.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01733
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court.. The order will not be added to the website. Signed by Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 07/11/2019. (AAS) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/15/2019) (LMY).
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Kick International Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Miller, Danieal)
June 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 8. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER of Service issued defendant All Defendants. sent to All Defendants on June 24, 2019 filed by Kick International Inc. d/b/a USMMAF. Waiver of Service due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Justin Brown, #2 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Ralph Cook, #3 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Orlando Jimenez, #4 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Dominick Cruz, #5 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Fotini Kandris, #6 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Jeffrey Roufus, #7 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Dr. Kramer, #8 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service to Giorgio Boscolo)(Miller, Danieal)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT For Emergency Injunctive and Other Relief against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Kick International Inc. d/b/a USMMAF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Miller, Danieal)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Emergency Injunctive and Other Relief against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7289640, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Kick International Inc. d/b/a USMMAF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miller, Danieal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kick International Inc. v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fotini Kandris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Ari Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Roufus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giorgio Boscolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Kramer, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kick International Inc. d/b/a USMMAF
Represented By: Danieal H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kick International Inc.
Represented By: Danieal H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?