Garred v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Steven Garred
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01766
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 ***REMARK; Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-04446, filed 08/02/2019. (DJO)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-143) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
June 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Seth Webb. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Steven Garred (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Webb, Seth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7292383, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Steven Garred. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Webb, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garred v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Garred
Represented By: Seth S. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?