South County Medical Investors LLC v. HR Acquisition I Corporation et al
Plaintiff: South county Medical Investors LLC
Defendant: HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Investors Inc and Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv01773
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Protective Order originally filed as a STIPULATION Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order by Plaintiff South County Medical Investors LLC. (Cohen, Steven) Modified event to a Motion on 8/15/2019 (KKS).
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff South County Medical Investors LLC. . (Cohen, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiffs Voluntary Withdrawal of Jury Demand [ #16 ]. Defendants consent to Plaintiffs withdrawal of jury demand. This motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Jury Demand [ #10 ] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/5/19. (JAB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Jury Demand by Plaintiff South County Medical Investors LLC. (Cohen, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, on the Court's own motion, that the Rule 16 Conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, August 21, 2019 at 10:30 a.m., pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, will now be heard in the chambers of the undersigned on Tuesday, August 27, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel who will try the case are required to attend in-person. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/25/2019. (CLO)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: On June 26, 2019, Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation and Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated filed a motion to strike #10 . Plaintiff has not filed a response to the motion. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause by no later than August 2, 2019, why Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation and Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated's motion should not be granted. (Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/23/2019. (CLO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen R Clark for all further proceedings. (District Judge Rodney W. Sippel no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/18/2019. (CBL)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/14/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/19. (ARL)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Jury Demand filed by Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated. (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Jury Demand by Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated. (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Strike Jury Demand Related to Plaintiffs Petition by HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated.(Hermeling, Caroline)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Attachment 3, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated. (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 24, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by South county Medical Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant HR Acquisition I Corporation. Parent companies: Healthcare Realty Trust Incorporated, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Healthcare Realty Trust Incorporated,. (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Healthcare Realty Investors Inc. Parent companies: Healthcare Realty Trust Incorporated, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Healthcare Realty Trust Incorporated,. (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants HR Acquisition I Corporation, Healthcare Realty Investors Inc Sent To: Plaintiff (Hermeling, Caroline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC02105, with receipt number AMOEDC-7293410, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Healthcare Realty Investors Inc, HR Acquisition I Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dawkins, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State court file, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Hermeling, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South County Medical Investors LLC v. HR Acquisition I Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR Acquisition I Corporation
Represented By: Caroline L. Hermeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Realty Investors Inc
Represented By: Caroline L. Hermeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Realty Services Incorporated
Represented By: Caroline L. Hermeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South county Medical Investors LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?