Webster v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jessica Webster
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01784
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jessica Webster. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (KJS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Plaintiff Jessica Webster. (AAS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
June 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USM. (CLA)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: administrative. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/26/19. (CLA)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. #2 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/26/19. (CLA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Jessica Webster. (MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to J.V.M.H. ; relationship to minor:MOTHER by Plaintiff Jessica Webster. (Overton, Kathleen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jessica Webster. (Overton, Kathleen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Jessica Webster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Office Regional Counsel, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Webster
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?