Little v. Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Devonte Little and Devonte L. Little
Defendant: Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01786
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 9] is GRANTED to and including August 31, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/19/19. (ALM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Devonte L. Little. (Williams, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.. (Martineau, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.. (Martineau, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerina Dominique Phillips for Defendant Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Jerina)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Consent Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Complaint [ECF No. 3] is GRANTED to and including August 14, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/23/19. (ALM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendant Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.. (Martineau, Joseph)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Martineau, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Andrew S. Williams. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Devonte L. Little Process Server: APS International, Ltd. (BAK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against defendant Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7296249, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Devonte Little. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2019: #3 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte Little
Represented By: Andrew S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte L. Little
Represented By: Andrew S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkstall Road Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Jerina Dominique Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?