Export Development Canada v. Ultimate Paintball, LLC
Plaintiff: Export Development Canada
Defendant: Ultimate Paintball, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01858
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant, Ultimate Paintball, LLC by Plaintiff Export Development Canada. (Blakeley, Scott)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Export Development Canada. Ultimate Paintball, LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Blakeley, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott E. Blakeley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7307896) by Plaintiff Export Development Canada. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Blakeley, Scott) filed by Export Development Canada; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/12/19. (KEK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings (AAS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott E. Blakeley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7307896) by Plaintiff Export Development Canada. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blakeley, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Scott Blakeley. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Export Development Canada. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Blakeley, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Export Development Canada Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Blakeley, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Ultimate Paintball, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7305889, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Export Development Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoices for the Goods)(Blakeley, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Export Development Canada v. Ultimate Paintball, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Paintball, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Export Development Canada
Represented By: Scott Blakeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?