Barrett v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: William Barrett
Defendant: Kelly, Bell, Glenn, US Marshals Service, Dowdi, Heather Westerfield and Shultz
Case Number: 4:2019cv01888
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Jul 3 17:03:54 CDT 2019 (admin,)
July 3, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
July 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (JWD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00487. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
July 3, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that (1) Petitioner is GRANTED provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and subject to modification by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri; and (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 06/26/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Willis, Kathy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by William Barrett. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/8/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by William Barrett. (Davies, Cindy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by William Barrett. (Davies, Cindy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Barrett. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshals Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Westerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?