Perkins-Moore v. Wilkie
Plaintiff: Angela Perkins-Moore
Defendant: Robert L. Wilkie
Case Number: 4:2019cv01892
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Angela Perkins-Moore to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela Perkins-Moore. Robert L. Wilkie served on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/7/2019. (Bent, Christopher) Modified Answer date on 8/20/2019 (KKS).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela Perkins-Moore. Defendant served on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/7/2019. (Bent, Christopher) Modified text of party being served on 7/11/2019 (KKS). Modified answer date on 8/20/2019 (KKS).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Angela Perkins-Moore Process Server: Same Day Process Server, Inc. (Bent, Christopher) DELETED - See corrected entry #5 ) on 7/12/2019 (KKS).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Christoper Bent. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Angela Perkins-Moore. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Robert L Wilkie with receipt number AMOEDC-7316079, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Angela Perkins-Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Department of Veterans Affairs)(Bent, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2019) (MFG). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/8/2019) (MFG). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/8/2019) (MFG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney) (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins-Moore v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Perkins-Moore
Represented By: Christopher B. Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?