Clayburn v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
Plaintiff: Varonica Clayburn
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, North County and St. Louis City
Case Number: 4:2019cv01900
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than September 12, 2019, plaintiff must file an amended complaint in accordance with the instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must mail to plaintiff along with a paper copy of this Memorandum and Order a blank Civil Complaint form. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by September 12, 2019, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/9/2019. (CLO)(Copy of Order and Civil Complaint form mailed as of this date)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Varonica Clayburn re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (JAB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Varonica Clayburn.(MFG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC01901, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Removal, #5 State court petition)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayburn v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varonica Clayburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?