Brown v. USA
Petitioner: Parrish Brown
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv01903
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Wed Aug 21 16:25:21 CDT 2019 (Bernsen, John)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant shall show cause, in writing and no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, why the instant 2255 motion should not be dismissed as time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if movant fails to timely comply with this Order, his 2255 motion will be denied and dismissed as time-barred. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/21/19. (JAB)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Parrish Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KKS)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send movant a 2255 form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant must complete the form and return it to the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If movant fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/26/2019. (CLO)(Form and Order mailed)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Sayler A. Fleming for Respondent USA. (Fleming, Sayler)
July 9, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jul 9 12:00:44 CDT 2019 (admin,)
July 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (DJO)
July 9, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Parrish Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Thomas J. Mehan
Represented By: Sayler A. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Parrish Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?