United States of America v. West Professional Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Missouri Department of Revenue, Walter D. West, Mary West, Mortgage Express Brokerage Co., Anthony G Tumminello and West Professional Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01906
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Missouri Department of Revenue.(Kisling, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings (KXS)
August 7, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff United States of America to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America Mortgage Express Brokerage Co. waiver signed on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mokodean, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America Anthony G Tumminello waiver signed on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mokodean, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America Mary West waiver signed on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mokodean, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America Walter D. West waiver signed on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mokodean, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America West Professional Enterprises, Inc. waiver signed on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mokodean, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 6. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service, #5 Waiver of Service, #6 Waiver of Service, #7 Waiver of Service)(Mokodean, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #8 Waiver of Service MDOR) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. West Professional Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Revenue
Represented By: Michael S. Kisling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter D. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Express Brokerage Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony G Tumminello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Professional Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory Louis Mokodean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?