The Cherokee Nation v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: The Cherokee Nation
Defendant: SpecGX, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc and Mallinckrodt PLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01911
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay..Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's final decision either transferring this action to the Opiate MDL or vacating its conditional transfer order. The parties must notify this Court within three days of the JPML's final decision either transferring this action to the MDL or vacating its conditional transfer order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/31/19. (MRS)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Soriano, Randy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff The Cherokee Nation. (Blair, William)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER:Case is temporarily stayed on the Court's own motion pending briefing and consideration of defendants' "motion to stay," #10. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/18/2019. (JMC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation For Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Remand In The Event The Case Is Not Stayed by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Soriano, Randy)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy) filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, SpecGX, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/17/2019. (JMC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Soriano, Randy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Bay, Peter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Plaintiff The Cherokee Nation. (Blair, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri by Plaintiff The Cherokee Nation. (Blair, William)
July 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by The Cherokee Nation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MFG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Soriano, Randy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC.. (Soriano, Randy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC02251, with receipt number AMOEDC-7322526, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Soriano, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cherokee Nation v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX, LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cherokee Nation
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?