RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. v. Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC
Plaintiff: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC d/b/a Bombshell Bar and Grill and Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01915
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC, d/b/a Bombshell Bar and Grill [ECF No. #6 ] is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (cc: deft) (KJS)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (KJS)
August 30, 2019 ***REMARK - Sent Doc #6 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default to the Exec_email box for review. (KJS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC d/b/a Bombshell Bar and Grill by Plaintiff RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Peter)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons by Plaintiff RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Hoffman, Peter)
July 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Peter B. Hoffman. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (BAK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Hoffman, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hoffman, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7323610, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons)(Hoffman, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. v. Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Peter B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC d/b/a Bombshell Bar and Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider-Wilson Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?