Rotter v. Lee
Plaintiff: Rose Rotter
Defendant: Joseph E Lee
Case Number: 4:2019cv01916
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Joseph E Lee.(Champion, Debbie)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 is set for Wednesday, September 25, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/20/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17N before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/21/2019. (CLO)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Rose Rotter. (JAB) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/16/19. (JAB)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Joseph E Lee, Plaintiff Rose Rotter. (JAB)
August 13, 2019 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Rose Rotter to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 7, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Rose Rotter to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Rose Rotter. (JAB)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Joseph E Lee , filed by Rose Rotter. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for Leave, #2 Form Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Ruttencutter, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Rose Rotter.(BAK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew Scott Wideman for Defendant Joseph E Lee. (Wideman, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph E Lee.(Champion, Debbie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Joseph E Lee Sent To: Plaintiff (Champion, Debbie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC02256, with receipt number AMOEDC-7323904, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Joseph E Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit State Court File, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Original Filing Form , #5 Civil Cover Sheet )(Champion, Debbie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotter v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E Lee
Represented By: Debbie S. Champion
Represented By: Matthew Scott Wideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Rotter
Represented By: Daniel J. Gauthier
Represented By: Eric A. Ruttencutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?