AT&T Services, Inc. et al v. Max Retrans LLC
Plaintiff: AT&T Services, Inc. and DirecTV, LLC
Defendant: Max Retrans LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01925
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 31 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC, Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (KCB)
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss , #29 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Martin, Scott)
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Scott)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Martin, Scott)
August 29, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Max Retrans LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/5/2019.) (TMT)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #22 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Brummond, Jeremy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Brummond, Jeremy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Brummond, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Additional Time for Defendant to File a Reply Brief (ECF No. #23 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., and DIRECTV, LLC, shall have until August 19, 2019, in which to file their Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and Defendant Max Retrans LLC shall have until September 2, 2019, in which to file its Reply thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/12/2019. (mmg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss and Additional Time for Defendant to File a Reply Brief by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Brummond, Jeremy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Non-Disclosure Agreement)(Martin, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion by Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Martin, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Non-Disclosure Agreement)(Martin, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Max Retrans LLC.. (Martin, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott P Martin for Defendant Max Retrans LLC. (Martin, Scott)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. Max Retrans LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Phillips, Jerina)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Docs. #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 ) filed by Sean A. Lev, Matthew M. Duffy, Frederick Gaston Hall, and Kevin J. Miller, counsel for AT&T Services, Inc. and DirecTV, LLC, are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sean A. Lev, Matthew M. Duffy, Frederick Gaston Hall, and Kevin J. Miller are admitted for the purpose of representing AT&T Services, Inc. and DirecTV, LLC in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 07/16/2019. (KBL)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 07/16/2019. (KBL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin J. Miller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7335878) by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jurisdictions Admitted, #2 Certificate of Good Standing DC Bar)(Miller, Kevin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Frederick Gaston Hall. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7335845) by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jurisdictions Admitted, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hall, Frederick)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew M. Duffy. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7335849) by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing DC Bar)(Duffy, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean A. Lev. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7335765) by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jurisdictions Admitted, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lev, Sean)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Oliver H. Thomas for Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Thomas, Oliver)
July 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Jeremy P. Brummond. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerina Dominique Phillips for Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Phillips, Jerina)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy P. Brummond for Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Brummond, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Complaint by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Brummond, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Complaint by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brummond, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC Process Server: Mark Smith, Markell & Associates, Inc. (Brummond, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff DirecTV, LLC.. (Brummond, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff AT&T Services, Inc... (Brummond, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Max Retrans LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7326789, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by AT&T Services, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Brummond, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Services, Inc. et al v. Max Retrans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Retrans LLC
Represented By: Scott P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy P. Brummond
Represented By: Jerina Dominique Phillips
Represented By: Oliver H. Thomas
Represented By: Frederick Gaston Hall
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Kevin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DirecTV, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy P. Brummond
Represented By: Jerina Dominique Phillips
Represented By: Oliver H. Thomas
Represented By: Frederick Gaston Hall
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Kevin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?