Brewer v. Stuber
Plaintiff: Christina Brewer
Defendant: Scott Stuber
Case Number: 4:2019cv01930
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/30/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/7/2019 11:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/4/19. (MRS)
July 26, 2019 ***REMARK Document #8 deleted as discovery. Counsel is reminded to review this court's Local Rules re: the filing of discovery. The next document shall carry #8 (MRS)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Scott Stuber.(Long, Laura)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine Mary Flett for Defendant Scott Stuber. (Flett, Katherine)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Scott Stuber Sent To: State Court - Executed (Long, Laura)
July 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Christina Brewer.(MFG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Scott Stuber Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Long, Laura)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 1911-CC00342, with receipt number AMOEDC-7328448, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Scott Stuber. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Circuit Court File, #2 Attachment State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Attachment Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Long, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Stuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stuber
Represented By: Laura Gerdes Long
Represented By: Katherine Mary Flett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Brewer
Represented By: Michael J. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?